Nomination of Taylor and Ellsworth : hearing before the Committee on Armed Services, United States Senate, Ninety-third Congress, second session on nomination of David P. Taylor, of Virginia, to be Assistant Secretary of the Air Force for Manpower and Reserve Affairs, vice Richard J. Borda, resigned : Robert Ellsworth, of New York, to be an Assistant Secretary of Defense, vice Robert C. Hill, resigned, May 23, 1974.
Saved in:
Corporate Author: | United States. Congress. Senate. Committee on Armed Services (Author) |
---|---|
Format: | Government Document Electronic eBook |
Language: | English |
Published: |
Washington :
U.S. Government Printing Office,
1974.
|
Series: | U.S. Congressional documents. Congressional hearings.
New York legal research library. Military and government. |
Subjects: | |
Online Access: | CONNECT CONNECT |
Similar Items
-
Nomination of Ellsworth, Greener, Perry, and Reed : hearing before the Committee on Armed Services, United States Senate, Ninety-fourth Congress, first session on nominations of Robert Ellsworth, of New York, to be a Deputy Secretary of Defense (new position) : William I. Greener, of Virginia, to be an Assistant Secretary of Defense, vice Joseph Laitin, resigned : Matthew J. Perry, Jr., of South Carolina, to be a judge of the U.S. Court of Military Appeals, vice Robert Emmett Quinn, retired : Thomas C. Reed, of California, to be Secretary of the Air Force, vice John L. McLucas, December 16, 1975.
Published: (1975) -
Nominations of John B. Taylor and John Michael Farren : hearing before the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs, United States Senate, One Hundred First Congress, first session on the nominations of John B. Taylor, of California, to be a member of the Council of Economic Advisers, vice Michael Mussa, resigned and John Michael Farren, of Connecticut, to be Under Secretary of Commerce for International Trade, vice W. Allen Moore, resigned, June 8, 1989.
Published: (1989) -
Durham, Taylor, and White nominations : hearing before the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources, United States Senate, One Hundred Third Congress, first session on the nominations of Archer L. Durham to be Assistant Secretary for Human Resources and Administration; William J. Taylor III to be Assistant Secretary for Congressional, Intergovernmental, and International Affairs; and William H. White to be Deputy Secretary of Energy, Department of Energy, June 8, 1993.
Published: (1993) -
Nomination of John J. Bennett, Everett T. Keech, and David R. Macdonald : hearing before the Committee on Armed Services United States Senate, Ninety-fourth Congress, second session on nominations of John J. Bennett, of Virginia, to be an Assistant Secretary of the Navy; vice Jack L. Bowers, resigning; Everett T. Keech, of the District of Columbia, to be an Assistant Secretary of the Air Force, vice Francis Hughes, resigned; David Robert Macdonald, of Illinois, to be Under Secretary of the Navy, vice David Samuel Potter, resigned, September 9, 1976.
Published: (1976) -
Nomination of George S. Brown, David P. Taylor, John J. Martin, and John Woodland Morris : hearings before the Committee on Armed Services, United States Senate, Ninety-fourth Congress, second session on nominations of Gen. George S. Brown to be Chairman of the Joint Chiefs of Staff for an additional two-year term; Hon. David P. Taylor to be Assistant Secretary of Defense for Manpower and Reserve Affairs; Dr. John J. Martin to be Assistant Secretary of the Air Force for Research and Development and Maj. Gen. John Woodland Morris, U.S. Army, to be Lieutenant General as Chief of Engineers, June 28 and 29, 1976.
Published: (1976)